judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-89-00221-CV
02-89-00221-CV
09/06/1989
Miscellaneous civil
McBride, Ronald T. and wife Cheryl L. McBride
Steward, Wayne E.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/08/1990Mandate Issued
09/19/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
09/12/1990Response Filed
08/24/1990Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/24/1990Motion Filed
08/15/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
07/31/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/28/1990Submitted
03/28/1990Submission
12/06/1989No Description Available.
11/28/1989Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/22/1989Brief Filed
11/09/1989Brief Filed
11/09/1989Motion Filed
10/12/1989Motion for Extension to file Transcript DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/12/1989Motion for Extension to File Transcript Filed
10/12/1989Submission
10/12/1989No Description Available.
10/03/1989No Description Available.
09/06/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
09/06/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/08/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Steward, Wayne E.Appellee
Mcbride, Ronald T.Appellant
Mcbride, Cheryl L.Appellant
Trial Court Information
355th District Court
Hood
Honorable John G Street
88439-C