judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-01047-CR
05-89-01047-CR
09/05/1989
Burglary
Pruitt, William Donald
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/11/2000Record RetentionRetain
08/17/1990Mandate Issued
08/17/1990Mandate Issued
06/20/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/20/1990Submitted
06/20/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/20/1990Submission
06/20/1990Submitted
05/10/1990Brief Filed
05/10/1990Case ready to be set
05/10/1990Case ready to be set
04/18/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
04/13/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/09/1990Motion to Strike DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/22/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.
03/22/1990Motion to Strike
03/21/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/19/1990Brief Filed
01/30/1990Brief Filed
01/22/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/17/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/08/1990Letter Sent by the Court
01/05/1990Brief Filed
11/27/1989Transcript Filed
11/10/1989Statement of Facts Filed
09/05/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/27/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
07/27/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/17/1990Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
204th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Richard Mays
F89-83015-JQ
30 years TDC