judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-01048-CR
05-89-01048-CR
09/05/1989
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Shabazz, Curtis - a/k/a Curtis Rollins
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/05/2003Letter Sent by the Court
08/22/2003Letter Received
12/12/1997Case Returned from Higher Ct.
10/27/1997Case Forwarded to Higher Court
10/24/1997Motion to Withdraw Record DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/23/1997Motion to Withdraw Record
10/22/1991Mandate Issued
10/22/1991Mandate Issued
10/08/1991Case Returned from Higher Ct.
06/13/1991Petition for Discretionary Review FiledRefused
04/22/1991Ext to file Petition for Discretionary Review DispMotion or Writ Granted
04/22/1991Ext to File Petition for Discretionary Review-CCA
04/15/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/15/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/01/1991Motion to File DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/20/1991Submission
03/20/1991Submitted
03/20/1991Submission
03/20/1991Submitted
02/12/1991Letter Sent by the Court
02/08/1991Brief Filed
01/25/1991Letter Sent by the Court
01/22/1991MattConv
01/15/1991Supplemental Brief Filed
12/10/1990Supplemental Brief Filed
12/06/1990Brief Filed
12/06/1990Case ready to be set
12/06/1990Case ready to be set
11/19/1990Letter Filed
11/15/1990Brief Filed
10/18/1990Order EnteredOtherwise Disposed
10/12/1990Order EnteredOtherwise Disposed
10/05/1990Statement of Facts Filed
09/27/1990Supplemental Transcript filed
07/24/1990Motion for Relief Disposed
07/18/1990Motion for Relief Filed
07/09/1990Brief Filed
07/09/1990Case ready to be set
07/05/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Denied
07/05/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/28/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
06/25/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/31/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/29/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/03/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/01/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/30/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/29/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/05/1990Mot for Ext Transcript DispMotion or Writ Granted
02/05/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/02/1990Mot - Ext. to File Transcript
02/02/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/10/1990Letter Sent by the Court
01/10/1990Transcript Filed
12/29/1989Statement of Facts Filed
12/19/1989Statement of Facts Filed
11/01/1989Mot Ext Time File Record DispMotion or Writ Granted
10/30/1989Extend Time to File Record
09/05/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/31/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
08/31/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/22/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
283rd Judicial District Court
Dallas
F89-95748-PT
Life TDC