judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-01050-CV
05-89-01050-CV
09/05/1989
Contract
Federal Deposit Insurance Corp., Receiver of First National
Kenneth E. Landers
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/18/2001Order EnteredDestroy
04/18/2001Record Pickup
12/17/1997Record RetentionDestroy
09/28/1990Mandate Issued
09/28/1990Mandate Issued
08/03/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/03/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/17/1990Submitted
04/17/1990Motion to Withdraw Appeal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/17/1990Submission
04/17/1990Submission
04/17/1990Submission
04/17/1990Submitted
04/16/1990Affidavit Filed
04/12/1990Motion to Withdraw Attorney
02/23/1990MattConv
11/21/1989Brief Filed
11/21/1989Case ready to be set
11/21/1989Case ready to be set
11/16/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/23/1989Brief Filed
10/19/1989MattConv
10/17/1989Motion to Substitute Attorney DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/13/1989Response to Motion
10/11/1989Collection letter on Filing Fee
10/04/1989Motion to Substitute Attorney
09/05/1989Transcript Filed
09/05/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/22/1989Appeal Bond Filed
05/23/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/18/2001Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
14th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable John M Marshall
88-16079-A