judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-89-00897-CV
01-89-00897-CV
09/05/1989
Divorce
Liandro, Rita
Liandro, Victor
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/30/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
05/30/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
05/12/1990No petition for review or writ of error was filed
04/27/1990Motion for rehearing was not filed
04/12/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/12/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/27/1990Submitted
03/27/1990Submission
03/27/1990Submitted
01/26/1990Submission
12/04/1989Case ready to be set
12/04/1989Case ready to be set
11/03/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
10/19/1989Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
10/03/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
09/08/1989Statement of facts filed
09/05/1989Transcript filed
09/05/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/12/1989Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/30/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppellantRene Lauro Torres
StateCivil - Ad LitemSherrtta D. Lee
StateAppelleeAdolph Uzick
Trial Court Information
311th District Court
Harris
87-06888