judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-01051-CV
05-89-01051-CV
09/05/1989
Contract
Aztec Financial Services, Kyle Pelt, Kim Pelt, John H. Pelt
Texas Western Federal Savings & Loan Association
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/18/2001Order EnteredDestroy
04/18/2001Record Pickup
10/26/2000Record RetentionDestroy
07/11/1990Mandate Issued
07/11/1990Mandate Issued
05/09/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/09/1990Order EnteredCase Severed
05/09/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/11/1990Submission
04/11/1990Submitted
04/11/1990Submission
04/11/1990Submitted
03/14/1990Submission
02/23/1990MattConv
02/07/1990Motion to Postpone DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/05/1990Motion for Postponement
01/31/1990MattConv
10/27/1989Brief Filed
10/27/1989Case ready to be set
10/27/1989Case ready to be set
10/02/1989Brief Filed
09/13/1989MattConv
09/05/1989Transcript Filed
09/05/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/14/1989Appeal Bond Filed
05/17/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/18/2001Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
192nd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Merrill L Hartman
88-7604-K