judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HODGERNEY (HARRY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 31423
Short Caption:HODGERNEY (HARRY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR961172Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:AgostiCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/27/1998How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/21/1997Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
11/21/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
02/03/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The district court shall have 30 days to (1) enter a written judgment or order or (2) inform this court that it is reconsidering its decision. If the court enters a written judgment the clerk shall immediately transmit a certified copy of the judgment or order to the clerk of this court. The clerk of the district court shall, within 120 days from the date of this order, transmit to this court a certified copy of the complete trial court record of this appeal as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings. 2[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court].
02/27/1998Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 2/25/98.
02/27/1998Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy.
02/27/1998Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
10/11/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. " . . . we affirm the order of the district court." SNP00A-WM/ML/NB 00-17972
11/07/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-18206
11/07/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/29/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 9, 2000. 00-18206