judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MAVERICK MOTORSPORTS GROUP, LLC v. DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE, STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0220)
Case Number:S-10-0220Case Docketed On:10/13/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Taxation and Revenue (Title 39)
Short Title:MAVERICK MOTORSPORTS GROUP, LLC v. DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE, STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:MAVERICK MOTORSPORTS GROUP, LLC, Appellant (Petitioner), v. DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE, STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMaverick Motorsports Group, LLCJohn Matthew Kuker
James Michael Peterson
AppelleeDepartment of RevenueBruce A. Salzburg
Michael L. Hubbard
William Francis Russell
Martin L. Hardsocg

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Taxation
Opinion Number:2011 WY 76
Citation:253 P.3d 125 (Wyo. 2011)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/13/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/13/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/13/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/13/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/24/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
11/29/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's opening briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/06/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
01/06/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee Wyoming Department of Revenue and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/11/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/14/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Martin L. Hardsocg and William F. Russell for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/24/2011Notice-Internal - Recusal memo - Justice BurkeNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
01/25/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/27/2011Order - Assignment of judge - David B. Park, District JudgeOrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
01/31/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - John M. Kuker for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/03/2011Notice-Incoming - No designation of record - from counsel for appellant.Notice-IncomingNo designation of recordFinal
02/03/2011Order - Sanction - designation of recordOrderSanction - designation of recordFinal
02/07/2011Fees - Sanctions received - designationFeesSanctions received - designationFinal
02/07/2011Notice-Incoming - Designation of record - Appellant - Filed in District CourtNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
02/14/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volumes II-III, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/14/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
02/15/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before Chief Justice Kite and Justices Golden, Hill and Voigt, and Park, DJ (James Matthew Kuker and James Michael Peterson, argument by Mr. Kuker for appellant; Martin L. Hardsocg, Senior Assistant Attorney General and William F. Russell, Senior Assistant Attorney General, argument by Mr. Russell for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
02/15/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
05/03/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, District Judge Park writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/19/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/19/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/19/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/19/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/24/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 5/23/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal