judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ALLEN DUDLEY V. ADRIANNE TODMAN, ET AL

Case Information: 10-OA-0029
Short Caption:ALLEN DUDLEY V. ADRIANNE TODMAN, ET ALClassification:Original Jurisdiction - Original Actions - Mandamus
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:10/29/2010

Opening Event Date:10/29/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerAllen Dudley N
Marc BorbelyNY
RespondentAdrianne Todman N
Todd S. KimNY
Mashanda MosleyNN
RespondentRonald Mccoy N
Todd S. KimNY
Mashanda MosleyNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/29/2010PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS -FILED PER 11/16/10 ORDER LW Denied
10/29/2010PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
11/02/2010TMC - (LODGED) PWM - motion for IFP
11/16/2010 ORDERED that the motion to proceed IFP IS GRANTED and the Clerk SHALL FILE the WRIT. It is *****MORE*****
11/16/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that the RESPONDENTS SHALL, W/N 10 DAYS from the date of this order, FILE A RESPONSE to the PWM. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the PWM IS HEREBY HELD IN ABEYANCE pending further order of the court. (RDBRNW) (rm)
11/16/2010TMC - PWM - response
11/24/2010RESP MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSE(Todman & McCoy) to 12/10/10
12/01/2010PETITIONER'S ANSWER/RESPONSE in opposition to mot for ext of time to file response.
12/02/2010 ORDERED that the MOTION IS GRANTED TO THE EXTENT that RESPONDENTS' RESPONSE to the PWM shall be filed no later than DECEMBER 6, 2010. (BY: ETW) lw
12/06/2010RESPONDENT'S OPPOSITION- to petitioner's request for writ of mandamus
12/20/2010FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
12/20/2010On consdieration of the petition for review and the response of respondent wherein a final order has issued, it is ORDERED that teh petition for writ of madamus is denied as moot. (RDBRNM)