Case: B-1424
B-1424
03/11/1969
Application for Writ of Error
TAYLOR COMMUNICATIONS, INC.
HARTE-HANKS NEWSPAPERS, INC., ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/28/1969 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
06/02/1969 | Supplemental Brief filed | Petitioner | | |
04/14/1969 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | | |
03/25/1969 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
03/11/1969 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/03/1969 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
11/28/1969 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
11/12/1969 | Opinion issued | | ||
06/02/1969 | Supplemental Brief filed | | ||
04/16/1969 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
04/16/1969 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
04/16/1969 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
04/14/1969 | Reply to Response | | ||
03/25/1969 | Response to Petition | | ||
03/11/1969 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
03/11/1969 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
TAYLOR COMMUNICATIONS, INC. | Petitioner | |
Harte-Hanks Newspapers, Inc., et al. | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information