judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-89-00220-CV
02-89-00220-CV
09/05/1989
Divorce
Reiter, David Eugene
Reiter, Frances Mae
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/06/1990Mandate Issued
10/03/1990Writ DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
06/14/1990Writ Filed
05/15/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
04/26/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
04/11/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/27/1990Submitted
03/27/1990Submission
03/26/1990Order Entered
12/05/1989Brief Filed
11/10/1989Brief Filed
10/12/1989No Description Available.
10/06/1989No Description Available.
10/06/1989Submission
09/05/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
09/05/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/06/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Reiter, David EugeneAppellant
Reiter, Frances MaeAppellee
Trial Court Information
235th District Court
Cooke
Honorable George Allen Crowley
84-831