judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 11th Court Of Appeals

Case: 11-89-00247-CR
11-89-00247-CR
09/05/1989
All Misdemeanors
State of Texas
Carter, Karen Suzanne
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/26/1990Mandate issued
05/10/1990Opinion issued
05/10/1990Opinion issued
05/10/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
04/12/1990Submitted
04/12/1990Submission set in Eastland
01/19/1990Supp. brief filed
01/12/1990Submission set in Eastland
12/29/1989Case ready to be set
12/29/1989Brief filed
12/08/1989Brief filed
11/22/1989Mot. - To file disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/22/1989Mot. - Ext. time to file record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/22/1989Clerk and/or Reporter's Record filed
11/15/1989Record received
11/15/1989Mot. - For leave/permission to file late article
11/09/1989Mot. - Ext. of time to file record
11/06/1989Inquiring on status, etc. of case
09/05/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/29/1989Judgment of trial court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/26/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Court
Erath
20,388