judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-89-00898-CV
01-89-00898-CV
09/05/1989
Miscellaneous/other civil
City of Houston and George Greanias
Hill, Jay Howard
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/21/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
11/21/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
11/08/1990Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
10/31/1990Writ disposedDismissed
08/10/1990Case file received by higher Court or agency.
08/08/1990Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency
08/01/1990Writ filed
07/24/1990Date final opinion release for publication
07/19/1990Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
06/07/1990Motion for rehearing filed
05/24/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Rendered
05/24/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Rendered
05/24/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Rendered
02/13/1990Submitted
02/13/1990Submission
02/13/1990Submitted
01/17/1990Supplemental brief filed
01/02/1990Submission
12/15/1989Supplemental brief filed
11/22/1989Motion to adavance appeal disposedGrant motion
11/10/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
11/10/1989Case ready to be set
11/10/1989Motion to advance or accelerate appeal filed
11/10/1989Case ready to be set
11/06/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
10/06/1989Statement of facts filed
09/05/1989Transcript filed
09/05/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/11/1989Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/21/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppellantHon. Jack Martin
StateAppellantByron G. Lee
StateAppelleeJames R. Spradlin
StateAppelleeW. James Kronzer
StateAppelleeLeslie C. Taylor
StateAppellantDiana K. Ball
Trial Court Information
165th District Court
Harris
89-30751