judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals

Case: 13-89-00355-CV
13-89-00355-CV
09/05/1989
Miscellaneous civil
El Campo Refrigerator-Cooler Company
Stillwell, James and Raney Stillwell
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/12/1989Mandate Issued
11/13/1989ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
10/26/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/26/1989Opinion issuedDismissed
10/19/1989Motion for Dismissal Filed
10/19/1989Green card in
10/12/198910 day letter sent
09/18/1989Supplemental transcript recieved
09/13/1989Due date for record to be filed
09/11/1989Filing Fee Paid
09/05/1989Statement of Facts Received
09/05/1989Transcript Filed
09/05/1989Transcript Received
09/05/1989Statement of Facts Filed
09/05/1989Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
09/05/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/12/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
El Campo Co.AppellantRandy M. Clapp
StillwellAppelleeLynn C. Grebe
Hon. John T. McDowell
Trial Court Information
329th District Court
Wharton
Honorable Daniel R Sklar
27,674-S