judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-89-00902-CR
01-89-00902-CR
09/05/1989
Other Drug Possession
Woods, George Harrl
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/11/1992Mandate issued - criminal or civil
08/11/1992Mandate issued - criminal or civil
07/24/1992Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
06/24/1992Petition for discretionary review disposedRefused
04/22/1992Case file received by higher Court or agency.
04/20/1992Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency
04/13/1992Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
03/10/1992Extension to file writ disposedGrant motion
02/28/1992Motion for rehearing was not filed
02/13/1992Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/13/1992Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/05/1992Submitted
02/05/1992Submission
02/05/1992Submitted
01/07/1992Submission
08/08/1991Case ready to be set
08/08/1991Case ready to be set
09/27/1990Statement of facts filed
06/21/1990Order entered
04/10/1990Submitted
02/06/1990Submission
12/12/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
12/12/1989Case ready to be set
11/20/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
10/30/1989Statement of facts filed
09/21/1989Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
09/06/1989Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
09/05/1989Transcript filed
09/05/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/19/1989Notice of appeal filed
05/05/1989Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/11/1992Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - AppellantWayne T. Hill
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn Brook
StateCriminal - State of TexasMargaret Stewart
Trial Court Information
179th District Court
Harris
519,256
by court