judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-89-00901-CR
01-89-00901-CR
09/05/1989
Burglary
Upchurch, Bill Clyde
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/11/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
06/11/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
05/26/1990No petition for review or writ of error was filed
05/11/1990Motion for rehearing was not filed
04/26/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/26/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/03/1990Submitted
04/03/1990Submission
04/03/1990Submitted
01/30/1990Submission
11/30/1989Case ready to be set
11/30/1989Waiver
11/30/1989Case ready to be set
11/28/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
10/30/1989Statement of facts filed
10/30/1989Transcript filed
09/05/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/31/1989Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
08/31/1989Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/11/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - AppellantKurt Gumberger
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
StateCriminal - State of TexasCalvin A. Hartmann
Trial Court Information
230th District Court
Harris
Honorable JOE KEGANS
511,629
40 yrs tdc