judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-01045-CV
05-89-01045-CV
09/06/1989
Habeas Corpus
Ex Parte: Don Conrad Dunlap, Relator
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/18/2001Order EnteredDestroy
04/18/2001Record Pickup
12/16/1997Record RetentionDestroy
01/18/1990Letter Filed
01/18/1990Letter Sent by the Court
01/11/1990Motion to Extend Time to File Writ Disp.Dismissed-Want of Jurisdiction
01/08/1990Letter Sent by the Court
12/27/1989Motion to Extend Time to File Writ
11/09/1989Order Entered
11/09/1989Order EnteredMotion or Writ Granted
11/09/1989Order EnteredMotion or Writ Granted
10/18/1989Response to Motion
10/17/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
10/13/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
10/13/1989Statement of Facts Filed
10/12/1989Order Entered
10/11/1989Letter Filed
09/22/1989Brief Filed
09/15/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
09/14/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/08/1989Letter Filed
09/07/1989MattConv
09/07/1989MattConv
09/06/1989Motion for Leave to File
09/06/1989Motion to File DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/06/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/18/2001Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
296th Judicial District Court
Collin
296-51058-88