judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-01055-CR
05-89-01055-CR
09/06/1989
Auto Theft
McLin, Ray Ervin
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/02/2020Order enteredDestroy
12/11/1992Mandate Issued
12/11/1992Mandate Issued
10/09/1992Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
10/09/1992Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
10/09/1992Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
09/22/1992Submitted
09/22/1992Submission
09/22/1992Submitted
09/08/1992Letter Sent by the Court
09/02/1992Case ready to be set
09/02/1992Supplemental Brief Filed
09/02/1992Case ready to be set
08/24/1992Mot.-Ext. File Sup Brief DispMotion or Writ Granted
08/13/1992Mot. for Ext. File Sup. Brief
08/13/1992Supplemental Brief Filed
06/26/1992Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/24/1992Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/26/1992Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/15/1992Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/16/1992Mandate IssuedReversed & Remanded to Ct. App
04/14/1992Case Returned from Higher Ct.Reversed & Remanded to Ct. App
03/20/1992Opinion issuedReversed & Remanded to Ct. App
03/20/1992Case remanded from higher court
12/21/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FiledMotion or Writ Granted
11/27/1990Ext to File Petition for Discretionary Review-CCA
10/23/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/23/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/17/1990Submission
10/17/1990Submitted
10/17/1990Submission
10/17/1990Submitted
08/20/1990MattConv
04/27/1990Brief Filed
04/27/1990Case ready to be set
04/27/1990Case ready to be set
04/23/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
04/19/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/22/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/19/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/21/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/20/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/25/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/24/1990Brief Filed
01/24/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/10/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/08/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/14/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/13/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/20/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/17/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/13/1989Statement of Facts Filed
10/11/1989Transcript Filed
09/06/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/31/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
08/16/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/02/2020Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
291st Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Gerry Holden Meier
F89-77728-LU
5 years TDC