judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-01052-CV
05-89-01052-CV
09/06/1989
Contract
Ellen Mattson, d/b/a Classic Homes by Ellen
Southwestern Carpets, Inc.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/18/2001Order enteredDestroy
06/18/2001Order EnteredDestroy
04/18/2001Record Pickup
12/18/1997Record RetentionDestroy
06/08/1990Mandate Issued
06/08/1990Mandate Issued
04/17/1990Motion for Dismissal DisposedReversed and Remanded
04/17/1990Submission
04/17/1990Motion for Dismissal DisposedReversed and Remanded
04/16/1990Motion for Dismissal Filed
02/23/1990MattConv
11/20/1989Brief Filed
11/20/1989Case ready to be set
11/20/1989Case ready to be set
10/26/1989Brief Filed
10/17/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/10/1989Response to Motion
10/02/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/26/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedDismissed
09/26/1989Motion to Compel DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/18/1989Response to Motion
09/06/1989Motion to Compel
09/06/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/05/1989Statement of Facts Filed
08/07/1989Transcript Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/18/2001Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 4
Dallas
cc89-1071-d