judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-89-00428-CR
04-89-00428-CR
09/06/1989
Habeas Corpus
Green, Norman Evans
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/17/1990Mandate Issued
01/17/1990Mandate Issued
11/30/1989Opinion issuedReversed
11/30/1989Opinion issuedReversed
11/22/1989Submitted
11/22/1989Submission
11/22/1989Submitted
11/09/1989Submission
11/09/1989Submission
11/01/1989Case ready to be set
11/01/1989Brief Filed
11/01/1989Case ready to be set
10/23/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/19/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
10/09/1989Brief Filed
09/21/1989Mot. EOT to file Record DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/21/1989Mot. EOT to file Record DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/20/1989Mot. EOT to file Record Filed
09/12/1989Mot. EOT to file NOA DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/08/1989Mot. EOT to file NOA Filed
09/07/1989No Description Available.
09/07/1989No Description Available.
09/06/1989No Description Available.
09/06/1989No Description Available.
09/06/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/21/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
06/30/1989Appealable Order signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/17/2015RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
01/17/2015Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
175th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Phil Chavarria, Jr.
85-CR-1174-A
denial of bond