judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-89-00224-CR
02-89-00224-CR
09/06/1989
Rape
Balawajder, Jeffrey Stephen
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/06/2003Case Returned from Higher Court
06/22/1992Mandate Issued
06/04/1992Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCARefused
06/04/1992Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCARefused
06/03/1992Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
06/03/1992Motion for Rehearing FiledMotion or Writ Denied
05/04/1992Motion for Rehearing Filed
04/15/1992Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCARefused
04/15/1992Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCARefused
04/07/1992Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA
02/07/1992Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA
02/05/1992Mo for Ext to File Petition for Discretionary ReviewMotion or Writ Granted
01/08/1992Case ready to be set
01/08/1992Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/08/1992Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
01/08/1992Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/08/1992Motion for Rehearing Granted
01/08/1992Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/27/1991Motion for Extension for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
11/26/1991Response Filed
11/21/1991Motion for Extension for Rehearing Filed
11/20/1991Motion for Rehearing Filed
11/05/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/01/1991Submitted
10/01/1991Submission
09/30/1991Letter Brief Filed
09/04/1991Brief Filed
09/04/1991Case ready to be set
09/04/1991Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/30/1991Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
08/14/1991Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/13/1991Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
07/30/1991Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/29/1991Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
07/01/1991Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/01/1991Objection Filed
06/28/1991Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
05/29/1991Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/28/1991Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
04/23/1991Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/22/1991Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
02/26/1991Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/26/1991Submission
02/21/1991Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
02/11/1991Amended Brief Filed
02/11/1991Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/06/1991Motion Filed
02/04/1991Mo for Ext to File Petition for Discretionary Review
01/21/1991Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/18/1991Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
12/28/1990Brief Filed
12/13/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/13/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
10/18/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/12/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
09/17/1990No Description Available.
08/16/1990Motion to Abate AppealMotion or Writ Granted
08/16/1990Motion to Abate AppealMotion or Writ Denied
07/30/1990Motion to Abate Appeal
07/20/1990Motion to Abate Appeal
05/09/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/04/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
04/26/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/25/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
03/26/1990No Description Available.
03/20/1990No Description Available.
02/27/1990Supplemental Brief Filed
02/19/1990Order Entered
02/19/1990Order EnteredAbated
01/24/1990Motion Filed
01/22/1990Motion Filed
01/17/1990Motion Filed
01/05/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/05/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
12/08/1989Criminal record or relator's record and/or exhibits
11/16/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
09/06/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
09/06/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/22/1992Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Balawajder, Jeffrey StephenCriminal - Appellant
Unknown UserCriminal - State of Texas
The State of TexasCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 4
Tarrant
Honorable Joseph Drago, III
0262452D
70 yrs.,TDC + $10,000.Fine