judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-89-00209-CV
02-89-00209-CV
09/06/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Marshall, Clyde, Surety (Commie Johnson, Jr.)
Texas,The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/20/1991Mandate Issued
02/13/1991Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCARefused
12/28/1990Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA
11/28/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
10/31/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
10/16/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/23/1990Submitted
05/23/1990Submission
05/14/1990Order Entered
04/27/1990Brief Filed
04/27/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/26/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
03/26/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/23/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
03/01/1990Brief Filed
01/30/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/29/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
12/28/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/27/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
12/01/1989Submission
11/27/1989No Description Available.
11/27/1989No Description Available.
11/27/1989No Description Available.
09/25/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
09/25/1989Request for Extension of Recorder's Record DisposdMotion or Writ Granted
09/21/1989Response Filed
09/14/1989No Description Available.
09/06/1989Extension to File Bond Filed for Original Proceed
09/06/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/20/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Unknown UserAppelleeJudge Dana Michelle Womack
Johnson, Jr., CommieAppellantClyde M. Marshall
Marshall, ClydeAppellantClyde M. Marshall
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 4
Tarrant
Honorable Joseph Drago, III
0299889DX