judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FAUSSET (BILLY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 31416
Short Caption:FAUSSET (BILLY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C90988Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/18/1998How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/21/1997Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
11/21/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
12/04/1997Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Order filed 10/22/97 and Notice of Entry filed 10/23/97 to Clark County Clerk. Due Date: 10 days
12/08/1997MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion for Reconsideration. (original and one copy).
12/12/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsReceived District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Order Denying Defendant's Motion to Amend Previous Response to District Attorney's Motion to Bar Habeas Corpus Action, filed in the district court on October 22, 1997 and Notice of Entry of Order, filed in the district court on October 23, 1997.
02/03/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. The clerk of the district court shall transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copy of the complete trial court record in each of the above-identified appeals, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 31416, 31486, 31487, 31489, 31527, 31671, 31672, 31735, 31736.
06/18/1998Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 3.
06/18/1998Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/20/1999MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion for Review. (Received the original and 2 copies - 1 returned to Appellant.)
06/02/1999MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion for Consolidation of Appeals (Received the original and 2 copies - 1 returned to Appellant.)
06/02/1999MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion for Review (Received the original and 2 copies - 1 returned to Appellant.)
11/22/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. " . . . we affirm the order of the district court." fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP00A- WM/MS/DA 00-20532
12/19/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-20760
12/19/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/11/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 28, 2000. 00-20760