judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KEVIN DAVIS V. COZETTE L. THOMAS

Case Information: 10-FM-1335
Short Caption:KEVIN DAVIS V. COZETTE L. THOMASClassification:Appeals - Family - Support
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:PCS2027-10Filed Date:10/19/2010

Opening Event Date:10/19/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/31/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:06/09/2011
Argued/Submitted:12/16/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/30/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKevin DavisNPro SeN
AppelleeCozette L. ThomasN
James C. McKay, Jr.YY
AppelleeDistrict of ColumbiaN
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/19/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/15/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on October 19, 2010 , it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the attached statement regarding transcript. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC)
11/29/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) 8/25/10 10/6/10 (Epps - ctrm. 119) 10/6/10 (Retchin - ctrm. 113) 10/13/10 (rt. needed)
12/17/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (47 pgs/tape) 8/25/10 proc.
12/17/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (104 pgs/tape) 10/13/10 proc.
12/17/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (15 pgs/tape) 10/13/10 proc.
12/17/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (36 pgs/tape) 10/6/10 proc.
12/17/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (43 pgs/tape) 10/6/10 proc w/cd
12/17/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE w/10-FM-1127
12/30/2010RECORD INDEX
01/12/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY - pending appeal and for immediate temporary stay pending this court's consideration (EMERGENCY)
01/13/2011TMC - appellant's EMERGENCY motion to stay appeal - DISTRICT'S motion to file (LODGED) oppo - appellant's motion to consolidate 10FM1127
01/19/2011APPELLEE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION until January 21, 2011
01/24/2011APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION - to aplt's motion for stay pending appeal (filed by District of Columbia)
01/26/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY - to aple's (D.C.) opposition to motion for stay pending appeal
01/31/2011On considertation of appelalnty's motion for stay, themotion of the District to file the lodged opposition, appellant's lodged reply, appellant's motion to consoliate, it is O that themotion to file lodged opp and reply is granted. it is O motion for stay denied. FO motion to consolidate denied.-more (RZFITE)
01/31/2011FO that appellant's brief and appendix shall be filed in 40 days and the brief or appellee 30 days thereafter. (RZFITE)
01/31/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/14/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
03/14/2011APPENDIX (attached to brief)
04/11/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE ****FILED AS THE BRIEF PER 6/9/11 ORDER LW
04/11/2011APPENDIX aple (d.c.) supplemental
04/12/2011TMC - motion for summary affirmance - oppo
04/18/2011APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION to aple's motion for Summary Affirmance and for oral argument for affirmative relief.
06/09/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR ORAL ARGUMENT IS DENIED. It is ***MORE****
06/09/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS DENIED.... It is FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLEE'S ALTERNATIVE REQUEST to file motion for summary affirmance as its brief IS GRANTED and the Clerk shall FILE THE MOTION AS ITS BRIEF. It is FURTHER ORDERED that this appeal shall be scheduled for consideration as soon as the calendar permits. (GLRDTE)
06/09/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF ***MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE FILED AS THE BRIEF PER 5/9/11 ORDER LW
06/09/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
06/09/2011FiledFinal Screening-Summary (TMC)
08/02/2011FiledMotion To Stay Appeal (Appellant)Denied
08/03/2011LodgedReceived - amended motion for stay pending appeal. (Appellant)
08/08/2011FiledTMC-MOTION TO STAY; AMENDED MOTION TO STAY; OPPO;REPLY
08/08/2011FiledOpposition - to aplt's motion for stay pending appeal (filed by D.C.) (Appellee District of Columbia)
08/11/2011FiledReply to Appellee's Opposition to Appellant's Motion for Stay Pending Appeal. (Appellant)
08/18/2011FiledOrder Denying APPELLANT'S MOTION TO STAY
11/03/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
12/16/2011FiledSubmitted to Judges Glickman, Reid, Belson
01/05/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Glickman and Oberly, Associate Judges, and Reid, Senior Judge.)
01/19/2012FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant) (titled as: motion for rehearing and rehearing en banc.)Denied
01/24/2012FiledMotion for leave to file an amended petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc (Appellant)Granted
03/16/2012FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (AMENDED) (Titled: motion to amend motion for rehearing and rehearing en banc) (Appellant)Denied
03/16/2012FiledOrder Granting Appellant's Motion For Leave to file an amended petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc
03/16/2012FiledOrder Denying Appellant's petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc
03/30/2012FiledMandate