judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-89-00204-CV
02-89-00204-CV
09/06/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Marshall, Clyde, Surety (Jimmy Dean aka Jimmy C.K. Dean)
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/20/1991Mandate Issued
02/13/1991Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCARefused
12/28/1990Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA
11/28/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
10/31/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
10/16/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/23/1990Submitted
05/23/1990Submission
05/14/1990Order Entered
04/27/1990Brief Filed
04/27/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed
04/26/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
03/26/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/23/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
03/01/1990Brief Filed
01/30/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/29/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
12/28/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/27/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
12/01/1989Submission
11/27/1989No Description Available.
11/27/1989No Description Available.
11/27/1989No Description Available.
09/25/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
09/25/1989Request for Extension of Recorder's Record DisposdMotion or Writ Granted
09/21/1989Response Filed
09/14/1989No Description Available.
09/06/1989Extension to File Bond Filed for Original Proceed
09/06/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/20/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Unknown UserAppelleeJudge Dana Michelle Womack
Dean, Jimmy Aka Jimmy C.k.deanAppellantClyde M. Marshall
Marshall, ClydeAppellantClyde M. Marshall
Trial Court Information
213th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable George S. Kredell
0328569DX