judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals

Case: 07-89-00288-CV
07-89-00288-CV
09/05/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Sherman, In the Interest of Curt Bryan, a Child
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/29/1990Mandate Issued
07/13/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
07/09/1990Response to any order, inquiry or motion
07/03/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
06/18/1990Mot. for extension of time to file Rehearing DispGRANT
06/18/1990Mot. for extension of time to file rehearing filed
06/18/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
06/04/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
04/17/1990Supplemental Brief Filed
04/12/1990Supplemental Brief Filed
04/04/1990Submitted
04/04/1990Supplemental Brief Filed
04/04/1990Submission
03/16/1990Submission
02/13/1990Motion to Accelerate DisposedGRANT
02/12/1990Motion to Accelerate Appeal Filed
02/06/1990Case ready to be set
02/06/1990Brief Filed
02/01/1990Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
02/01/1990Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
12/29/1989Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
12/29/1989Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
12/01/1989Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
12/01/1989Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
11/06/1989Brief Filed
09/25/1989Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
09/21/1989Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
09/05/1989Clerk`s Record and Reporter's Record Filed
09/05/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/29/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
140th District Court
Lubbock
Honorable William Shaver
83-501,448