judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-89-00199-CV
02-89-00199-CV
09/05/1989
Mandamus
Clawson, George N. et ux, Virginia F. Clawson
Mullin, Hon. James O., Judge 43rd District Court, Parker Co.
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/20/1990Case stored
01/31/1990Opinion issuedDismissed
01/11/1990Letter of Inquiry
10/04/1989Submitted
10/04/1989Submission
09/27/1989Brief Filed
09/20/1989Response Filed
09/06/1989Submission
09/06/1989Petition for Original Proceeding
09/06/1989Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/05/1989Motion to File
09/05/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/20/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
43rd District Court
Parker
Honorable James O. Mullin, Judge, 43rd District Court
33,863