judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-01057-CR
05-89-01057-CR
09/06/1989
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Liggins, Carlus Michelle
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/15/2001Record RetentionRetain
05/16/1991Mandate Issued
05/16/1991Mandate Issued
03/04/1991Ext to File Petition for Discretionary Review-CCAMotion or Writ Granted
01/25/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/25/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/18/1990Submission
12/18/1990Submitted
12/18/1990Submission
12/18/1990Submitted
10/24/1990MattConv
07/31/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
07/30/1990Brief Filed
07/30/1990Case ready to be set
07/30/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
07/30/1990Case ready to be set
07/19/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
07/18/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
07/06/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
07/03/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
06/05/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/04/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/10/1990Brief Filed
04/18/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
04/12/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/19/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/14/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/12/1990Statement of Facts Filed
01/31/1990Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
01/30/1990Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
01/05/1990Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
01/04/1990Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
11/01/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
10/30/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
10/25/1989Transcript Filed
09/06/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
09/06/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/31/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/16/1991Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 3
Dallas
Honorable R. T. Scales
F89-83267-RJ
Life TDC