judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-01058-CV
05-89-01058-CV
09/06/1989
Other Personal Injury
Brown, Bobby Ray
George Grubbs, Jr.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/18/2001Order EnteredDestroy
04/18/2001Record Pickup
12/17/1997Record RetentionDestroy
12/21/1989Mandate Issued
12/21/1989Mandate Issued
10/30/1989Order EnteredDismissed
10/30/1989Order EnteredDismissed
10/27/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Otherwise Disposed
10/27/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/27/1989Response to Motion
10/20/1989Brief Filed
10/02/1989Brief Filed
09/12/1989Letter Sent by the Court
09/06/1989Transcript Filed
09/06/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/11/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
07/20/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/18/2001Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
162nd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Catherine J. Crier
88-7846-I