judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-89-00896-CV
01-89-00896-CV
09/05/1989
Contract
J & J Equipment, Inc.
Meyerson Construction Co., Blair Site & Excavating et.al.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/27/1991Mandate issued - criminal or civil
02/27/1991Mandate issued - criminal or civil
01/17/1991Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
01/09/1991Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
10/24/1990Writ disposedMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
08/03/1990Case file received by higher Court or agency.
07/27/1990Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency
07/16/1990Writ filed
06/14/1990Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
06/07/1990Motion for rehearing filed
05/24/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/24/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/10/1990Motion strans disposedMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
04/27/1990Motion for leave to file strans
04/24/1990Submitted
04/24/1990Submission
04/24/1990Submitted
02/06/1990Submission
11/29/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
11/29/1989Case ready to be set
11/29/1989Case ready to be set
11/02/1989Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
10/30/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
10/26/1989Supplemental transcript filed
10/18/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
10/18/1989Supplemental transcript filed
10/05/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
10/05/1989Motion strans disposedGrant motion
10/05/1989Motion strans disposedGrant motion
09/22/1989Motion for leave to file strans
09/19/1989Motion for leave to file strans
09/13/1989Filing fee paid
09/05/1989Statement of facts filed
09/05/1989Transcript filed
09/05/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/07/1989Appeal bond filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/27/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppelleeWalter A. Wright
StateAppelleeHon. Patricia Hancock
StateAppelleeRichard F. Greenleaf
StateAppelleeRob L. Wiley
StateAppellantHoward A. Lang, Jr.
StateAppellantPeggy S. Supak
Trial Court Information
133rd District Court
Harris
87-19405