judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

THERESA WRIGHT V. KEVIN POWELL

Case Information: 10-FM-1370
Short Caption:THERESA WRIGHT V. KEVIN POWELLClassification:Appeals - Family - Support
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DRB2577-07Filed Date:10/28/2010

Opening Event Date:10/28/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/11/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTheresa Wright NPro SeN
AppelleeKevin Powell NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/28/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/18/2010 ORDERED that APPELLANT SHALL, W/N 20 days from the date of this order, show how she is AGGRIEVED by the September 28, 2010 order and why this appeal should not be dismissed for LACK OF STANDING in light of the parties' consent. In Re: C.T., 724 A.2d 590 (DC 1999). (BY: ETW)
11/18/2010TMC - OTSC - ROTSC
12/08/2010APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSE until December 27, 2010
12/09/2010 ORDERED that the MOTION IS GRANTED and APPELLANT'S RESPONSE to this court's NOVEMBER 18, 2010 OTSC shall be filed NO LATER THAN DECEMBER 27, 2010. (CASTILLO) LW
12/27/2010RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - to court order
01/20/2011 ORDERED, SS, that the ORDER ON APPEAL IS HEREBY VACATED and the CASE REMANDED TO THE TRIAL COURT for it to consider the merits of the motion for reconsideration of the support order in light of the changed circumstances, since the motion does not effect the order presently on appeal... (BRTEFA) (jl)
01/20/2011REMANDED
02/11/2011MANDATE ISSUED