judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DON WOOD, BRENDA WOOD v. LETITIA C. ABROMATS, PHILIP E. ABROMATS

Case Heading (S-08-0196)
Case Number:S-08-0196Case Docketed On:09/03/2008
Linked To: S-08-0195
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Big Horn CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:DON WOOD, BRENDA WOOD v. LETITIA C. ABROMATS, PHILIP E. ABROMATS
Full Title:DON WOOD, BRENDA WOOD, Appellants (Defendants), v. LETITIA C. ABROMATS, PHILIP E. ABROMATS, Appellees (Plaintiffs).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDon WoodHadassah Marie Reimer
Bradley Trent Cave
AppellantBrenda WoodHadassah Marie Reimer
Bradley Trent Cave
AppelleeLetitia C. AbromatsPhilip E. Abromats
AppelleePhilip E. Abromats Pro Se

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Defamation, Immunity
Opinion Number:2009 WY 100
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/03/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/03/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
09/03/2008Order - Sanction - notice of appealOrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
09/03/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/03/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/08/2008Fees - Sanctions received - NOAFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
10/20/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
10/21/2008Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellants Don and Brenda Wood and copy of designation of record on appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/08/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/09/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Opposing Brief of Plaintiffs - AppelleesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/30/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/06/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, seven volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volumes III-IV, Exhibits; Volume V, Original Papers; Volume VI, DVD's; Volume VII, Transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/06/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/07/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
01/09/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/22/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Dessa Reimer for Appellee Wood.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/27/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Philip Abromats for appellants Abromats.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/17/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Philip E. Abromats for appellants; Bradley Trent Cave and Hadassah Marie Reimer, argument by Ms. Reimer for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
02/17/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
08/19/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/25/2009Motion - Reconsideration - "Unopposed Motion to Amend Opinion."MotionReconsiderationFinal
08/27/2009Response/Objection - OtherResponse/ObjectionOtherFinal
08/27/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Unopposed Motion to Amend OpinionEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/27/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Don and Brenda Wood's response to unopposed motion to amend opinion.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/31/2009Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
08/31/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellees' Rule 105 request for costs.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/09/2009Order - Other - Order denying motion to amend opinion and order awarding costs for publication of briefs.OrderOtherFinal
09/09/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/09/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/09/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/09/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/11/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 9/10/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal