judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-2595
A-2595
03/02/1950
Application for Writ of Error
MOORE, INC., ET AL.
YORK OIL FIELD SERVICE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/18/1950Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/27/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
03/10/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/04/1950Response to Motion filed
04/18/1950Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/27/1950Response to Petition
03/10/1950Application for Writ of Error - Filed
03/10/1950Document received (See Remarks)
03/02/1950Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
York Oil Field Service CompanyRespondent
Moore, Inc., et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information