judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-2565
A-2565
02/15/1950
Application for Writ of Error
JODIE MCADAMS
DALLAS RAILWAY AND TERMINAL COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/24/1950Motion for RehearingRespondent
04/15/1950Brief on the MeritsRespondent
04/01/1950Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
02/20/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
02/15/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/24/1950Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/10/1950Opinion issued
04/15/1950Brief on the Merits
04/01/1950Brief in Support of Petition
03/08/1950Document received (See Remarks)
03/08/1950Document received (See Remarks)
02/20/1950Response to Petition
02/15/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
02/15/1950Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Jodie McAdamsPetitioner
Dallas Railway and Terminal CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information