judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

NANCY N. PETROVIC V. NATHAN A. FORRESTER

Case Information: 10-FM-1369
Short Caption:NANCY N. PETROVIC V. NATHAN A. FORRESTERClassification:Appeals - Family - Domestic Relations
Lead: 10-FM-1286 Consolidated:10-FM-1369
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DRB3458-02Filed Date:10/28/2010

Opening Event Date:10/28/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/30/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
Appellant-Cross-AppelleeNancy N. Petrovic N
Judith L. WalterNN
Appellee-Cross-AppellantNathan A. Forrester N
Alan B. SoschinNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/28/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/17/2010 ORDERED that APPEAL NOS. 10FM1286 and 10FM1369 are hereby CONSOLIATED for all purposes. It is *****MORE*****
11/17/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLEE/APPELLANT shall W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this APPEAL NO 10FM1369 should not be dismissed as having been PREMATURELY FILED... (BY:ETW)
11/23/2010RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - to 11/3/10 order (10FM1286)
12/07/2010RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (BY: PETROVIC) LW
12/09/2010 ORDERED that these APPEALS ARE HEREBY DISMISSED as PREMATURELY FILED but W/O PREJUDICE to the parties filing new appeals once Petrovic's motion has been resolved. See DC App. R. 4(a)(4). (RZNBTE) (rm)
12/09/2010DISMISSED
12/30/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/17/2014FiledArchived