judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-2767
A-2767
03/22/1950
Application for Writ of Error
SUPERIOR OIL COMPANY, ET AL.
STANOLIND OILD GAS COMPANY, STANOLIND OIL GAS COMAPNY, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/13/1951Response to Brief filedRespondent
06/25/1951Reply to ResponseAmicus Curiae
06/21/1951Response to Brief filedRespondent
06/18/1951Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
06/07/1951Response to Brief filedRespondent
05/29/1951Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
05/17/1951Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/28/1951Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
02/03/1951Response to Brief filedRespondent
11/24/1950Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
11/20/1950Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
11/16/1950Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
11/01/1950Motion for RehearingPetitioner
07/10/1950Errata FiledPetitioner
07/07/1950Reply to ResponsePetitioner
07/01/1950Response to Brief filedRespondent
06/29/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
06/27/1950Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
03/22/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/02/1952Letter Filed
08/13/1951Response to Brief filed
06/25/1951Reply to Response
06/21/1951Response to Brief filed
06/18/1951Amicus Curiae Brief received
06/07/1951Response to Brief filed
05/29/1951Brief in Support of Petition
05/17/1951Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/02/1951Dissenting opinion issued.
05/02/1951Opinion issued
02/28/1951Brief on the Merits
02/03/1951Response to Brief filed
01/10/1951Document received (See Remarks)
01/10/1951Document received (See Remarks)
11/24/1950Amicus Curiae Brief received
11/20/1950Supplemental Brief filed
11/16/1950Brief in Support of Petition
11/01/1950Motion for RehearingFiling granted
07/10/1950Errata Filed
07/07/1950Reply to Response
07/01/1950Response to Brief filed
06/29/1950Response to Petition
06/27/1950Brief in Support of Petition
06/22/1950Document received (See Remarks)
03/22/1950Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Superior Oil Company, et al.Petitioner
Busby, Harrell Trice, Ada, Oklahoma Wm. N. Bonner, Houston, TexasAmicus Curiae
Stanolind Oil Gas Comapny, et al.Respondent
Wm. N. BonnerAmicus Curiae
Stanolind Oild Gas CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information