judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-5602
B-5602
10/21/1975
Application for Writ of Error
HENRY ABALOS
OIL DEVELOPMENT COMPANY OF TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/11/1976Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedPetitioner
09/27/1976Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedRespondent
08/05/1976Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
01/26/1976Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
01/26/1976Letter brief Respondent
11/03/1975Response to PetitionRespondent
10/21/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/24/1976Concurring Opinion issued.
11/24/1976Dissenting opinion issued.
11/24/1976Opinion issued
10/11/1976Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed
09/27/1976Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed
08/05/1976Amicus Curiae Brief received
01/26/1976Supplemental Brief filed
01/26/1976Letter brief
12/17/1975Document received (See Remarks)
12/17/1975Document received (See Remarks)
11/03/1975Response to Petition
10/21/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
10/21/1975Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Oil Development Company of TexasRespondent
Henry AbalosPetitioner
J. H. EdgarAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information