judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JEANNISE PROCTOR-CLAGETT V. DC DEPT OF EMPLOYMENT SVCS.

Case Information: 10-AA-1332
Short Caption:JEANNISE PROCTOR-CLAGETT V. DC DEPT OF EMPLOYMENT SVCS.Classification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Worker's Compensation
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CRB156-10Filed Date:10/28/2010

Opening Event Date:10/28/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/19/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/14/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
Intervenor-RespondentGeorgetown University HospitalN
John C. Duncan NN
Intervenor-RespondentSedwick Cms N
John C. Duncan NN
PetitionerJeannise Proctor-Clagett N
Benjamin T. BoscoloNY
RespondentD.C. Department of Employment Services - Worker's Comp.N
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/28/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW
10/28/2010FILING FEE of $100.00.
10/29/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, Todd Kim, Esq & Gregory Lamb, Esq.
11/19/2010RECORD ON APPEAL
11/19/2010RECORD COMPLETED
11/24/2010NOTICE OF INTENT TO INTERVENE of Georgetown University Hospital & Sedwick CMS on behalf of Respondent.
12/09/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's and intervenor's briefs shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
01/13/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR STAY- of appeal case (no oppo)
01/28/2011ORDER GRANTING PETITIONER MOTION FOR STAY pending further order of this court. It is F/O that while this matter remains stayed, counsel for petitioner shall advise this court every 30 days as to the status of the settlement agreement, and within 15 days of the approval of the settlement. (ETW)
01/28/2011CASE STAYED
02/24/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL
03/09/2011PROCEED WITH APPEAL, NO LONGER ON HOLD/STAYED the stay entered by this court on January 28, 2011 is hereby vacated. It is (MORE)
03/09/2011ORDER GRANT PTNR MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL
03/09/2011DISMISSED
11/14/2011FiledMandate