judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SCOTT and CONNIE HEIMER v. ANTELOPE VALLEY IMPROVEMENT and SERVICE DISTRICT

Case Heading (S-08-0169)
Case Number:S-08-0169Case Docketed On:08/07/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:SCOTT and CONNIE HEIMER v. ANTELOPE VALLEY IMPROVEMENT and SERVICE DISTRICT
Full Title:SCOTT and CONNIE HEIMER, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. ANTELOPE VALLEY IMPROVEMENT and SERVICE DISTRICT, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantScott HeimerTom C. Toner
Kendal Royce Hoopes
AppellantConnie HeimerTom C. Toner
Kendal Royce Hoopes
AppelleeAntelope Valley Improvement & Service DistrictRick L. Koehmstedt

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Governmental Claims, Limitation of Actions
Opinion Number:2010 WY 29
Citation:226 P.3d 860 (Wyo. 2010)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/07/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/07/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/07/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
08/07/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/18/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
09/19/2008Event - Hardcopy received brief of appellants Scott & Connie Heimer and entry of appearance and received copy of brief on diskEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/16/2008Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/20/2008Event - Hardcopy received appellee's motion for extension of timeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/20/2008Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/22/2008Event - Hardcopy received - motion with original signatureEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/05/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/08/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and received copy of Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/24/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/02/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
01/02/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/02/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/09/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/14/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Tom Toner for appellant; Rick L. Koehmstedt for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/18/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Tom C. Toner for appellants; Rick L. Koehmstedt for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
02/18/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/18/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/05/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/05/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/05/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/05/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/09/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 4/8/2010.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal