judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LADNER VS. COURTESY IMPORTS C/W 35955

Case Information: 36321
Short Caption:LADNER VS. COURTESY IMPORTS C/W 35955Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 35955 *, 36321Related Case(s): 35955
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A400720Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/17/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/20/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
06/20/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-10567
06/20/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
06/29/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Michael Ladner--Travelers Express M.O. #74026557605.
07/11/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Original record due: 30 days. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 00-11800
08/17/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 00-14397
08/17/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
08/17/2000Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Gerald D. Waite, attorney for Respondent Americredit. Documents attached include letter dated January 19, 2000, Order Granting Defendant Americredit Financial Services' Motion to Supplement Record on Appeal filed in district court on July 18, 2000 and Certificate of Service. (Nos. 35955 and 36321).
08/31/2000Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Thea Marie Sankiewicz, attorney for Courtesy Imports, enclosing copies of Notice of Entry of Order filed in district court on July 13, 2000; Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Supplement Record on Appeal and Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Supplement Record on Appeal filed in district court on July 6, 2000; and letter to Judge Saitta from attorney Robert Nersesian dated March 15, 2000. Nos. 35955/36321 Doc. No. 00-15373
09/05/2000Letter/IncomingReceived Proper Person Letter. W/attached documents. (Nos. 35955 and 36321).
09/07/2000MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion to Consolidate the Above Two Appellate Cases. (Nos. 35955 and 36321).
04/15/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. fn1[We grant appellant's motion to consolidate these cases. NRAP 3(b). Although appellant was not granted leave to proceed in proper person under NRAP 46(b), we have received and considered appellant's documents.] As the district court appropriately granted summary judgment to respondents, we affirm the award of costs. Because no timely objection to Courtesy Imports' memorandum of costs was filed, the district court was not required to hold a hearing on the matter. We have considered appellant's remaining claims, and conclude that they are without merit. "We therefore affirm the district court's orders." SNP02M-WM/DA/ML. Nos. 35955/36321. See Order Denying Petition for Rehearing and Clarifying Order of Affirmance filed July 18, 2002 for clarification of this order filed April 15, 2002. 02-06698
05/02/2002Post-Judgment PetitionReceived Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 35955/36321. (02-07736)
07/18/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Order Denying Petition for Rehearing and Clarifying Order of Affirmance. 'We hereby deny rehearing in appeal no. 35955, but clarify our prior order of affirmance as set forth above. In light of our disposition of appeal no. 35955, the petition for rehearing is denied as it relates to appeal no 36321.' fn5[A formal motion for costs was unnecessary because such awards are mandatory to the prevailing party.] SNNP02M-WM/DA/ML. Nos. 35955/36321. 02-12291
08/02/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-12795
08/02/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/09/2002Other Returned Unfiled Document. Returned with letter: original and three copies of the Motion/Request for Reconsideration on Order Denying Petition for Rehearing and Clarifying Order of Affirmance. Nos. 35955/36321.
08/22/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 13, 2002. 02-12795
10/01/2002MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Appellant's Motion to Proceed in Proper Person in the Matters about this Cause of Action before Honorable Court of Law. Nos. 35955/36321. (02-16973)
10/01/2002MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion to Recall the Remittitur and Motion to Correct Errors of the Order Denying Petition for Rehearing and Clarifying Order of Affirmance. Nos. 35955/36321. (02-16975)
10/10/2002Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Supplement to: Motion to Recall the Remitittur and Motion to Correct Errors of the Order Denying Petition for Rehearing and Clarifying Order of Affirmance. Nos. 35955/36321. (02-17539)
11/07/2002RemittiturIssued Return Letter. Returned Record on Appeal this day. 02-12795
12/23/2002RemittiturFiled Letter: Entered Receipt for Documents. Received by County Clerk on November 12, 2002. 02-12795
01/10/2003Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Denied. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed October 12, 2002 and placed on the docket as Case No. 02-8203. Nos. 35955/36321 (03-00555).
03/17/2003Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Granted. The petition for a writ of ceritorari is denied. Nos. 35955/36321 [03-04419]
04/29/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On October 1, 2002, Mr. Ladner submitted a motion to proceed in proper person. See NRAP 46(b). On that same date, Mr. Ladner submitted a proper person motion to recall the remittitur and correct alleged errors in this court's July 18, 2002, order. On October 10, 2002, Mr. Ladner submitted a supplement to his motion to recall remittitur and correct errors. Cause appearing, we grant Mr. Ladner's motion to proceed in proper person for the limited purpose of allowing Mr. Ladner to file his October 1, 2002, motion to recall remittitur and correct errors and his October 10, 2002, supplement. The clerk of this court shall file the documents received on October 1, 2002, and October 10, 2002. In his October 1, 2002, motion and October 10, 2002, supplement Mr. Ladner requests this court to extend the time for filing a petition for en banc reconsideration of the July 18, 2002, order and recall the remittitur while the court considers his petition. No good cause appearing, we deny Mr. Ladner's motion. Nos. 35955/36321. (03-07302)
04/29/2003MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Appellant's Motion to Proceed in Proper Person in the Matters about this Cause of Action before Honorable Court of Law. Nos. 35955/36321. (02-16973)
04/29/2003MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Motion to Recall the Remittitur and Motion to Correct Errors of the Order Denying Petition for Rehearing and Clarifying Order of Affirmance. Nos. 35955/36321. (02-16975)
04/29/2003Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Supplement to: Motion to Recall the Remitittur and Motion to Correct Errors of the Order Denying Petition for Rehearing and Clarifying Order of Affirmance. Nos. 35955/36321. (02-17539)
05/09/2003Other Returned Unfiled Document. Original and two copies of the document entitled, "Petition for Request for Reconsideration on Order Resolving Motions." Nos. 35955/36321.
09/29/2003Other Returned Unfiled Document. Returned, with letter, "Contention of Misunderstanding on Behalf of the Court in Regards to the Order Resolving Motions," "Appellant's Motion to Proceed in Proper Person in the Matter about this Cause of Action before the Honorable Court of Law," and "Motion to Recall the Remittitur and Motion to Correct the Order Resolving Motions which Includes the Motion to Correct Errors of the Order Denying Petition for Rehearing." Nos. 35955/36321.