judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-5577
B-5577
10/10/1975
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
JESSEN ASSOCIATES, INC.
BOB BULLOCK, COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/31/1975Motion for RehearingRespondent
10/31/1975Brief on the MeritsRespondent
10/29/1975Response to PetitionRespondent
10/22/1975Supplement to ResponseRelator
10/22/1975Exhibits in case/cause filedRelator
10/22/1975Response to Brief filedRelator
10/22/1975Brief in Support of PetitionRelator
10/22/1975Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedRelator
10/21/1975Brief on the MeritsRespondent
10/20/1975Supplemental Brief filedRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/09/1976Letter Filed
01/08/1976Response to Motion filed
12/31/1975Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/17/1975Mandate issued
10/31/1975Brief on the Merits
10/29/1975Response to Petition
10/22/1975Supplement to Response
10/22/1975Exhibits in case/cause filed
10/22/1975Response to Brief filed
10/22/1975Brief in Support of Petition
10/22/1975Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed
10/21/1975Brief on the Merits
10/21/1975Response to Motion filed
10/20/1975Supplemental Brief filed
10/10/1975Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Bob Bullock, Comptroller of Public AccountsRespondent
Jessen Associates, Inc.Relator
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information