judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-5554
B-5554
10/01/1975
Application for Writ of Error
STATE OF TEXAS
SUPERIOR OIL COMPANY, ET AL., EXXON CORPORATION AND EXXON PIPELINE COMPANY, LOGUE AND PATTERSON, INC., ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/22/1976Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/05/1975Response to PetitionRespondent
10/16/1975Response to PetitionRespondent
10/01/1975Appendix FiledPetitioner
10/01/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/22/1976Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/05/1975Response to Petition
10/16/1975Response to Petition
10/14/1975Adopt by Reference pursuant to Tex. R. App. P. 9.7
10/01/1975Appendix Filed
10/01/1975Application for Writ of Error - Filed
10/01/1975Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
State of TexasPetitioner
Logue and Patterson, Inc., et al.Respondent
Superior Oil Company, et al.Respondent
Exxon Corporation and Exxon Pipeline CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information