judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-80-06490-CV
08-80-06490-CV
10/08/1975
Miscellaneous civil
Knapp, R. E., et al.
Wilson, Roy L.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/07/1985No description available.
02/15/1985No description available.
10/04/1980Mandate Issued
10/04/1980No description available.
01/01/1979Judgment IssuedDismissed
01/01/1979Mandate Issued
01/01/1979Submission
01/01/1979Submitted
01/01/1979Case ready to be set
01/01/1979Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/18/1979Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppellant
UnknownAppellee
UnknownAppellee
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 3
El Paso
30774