judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-5581
B-5581
10/14/1975
Application for Writ of Error
TEXACO INC.
ROBERT S. CALVERT, COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/16/1976Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/28/1975Response to PetitionRespondent
10/14/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/09/1976Letter Filed
01/20/1976Response to Motion filed
01/16/1976Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/28/1975Response to Petition
10/14/1975Application for Writ of Error - Filed
10/14/1975Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Robert S. Calvert, Comptroller of Public Accounts, et al.Respondent
Texaco Inc.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information