judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-5599
B-5599
10/21/1975
Application for Writ of Error
JINKINS HEIRS, ET AL., UNKNOW HEIRS OF HOPE PIERCE TARTT, DECEASED, LEE GROUP OF MATERNAL KINDRED
ESTATE OF HOPE PIERCE TARTT, DECEASED
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/07/1976Response to Brief filedRespondent
03/23/1976Supplement to Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/19/1976Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/18/1976Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/31/1975Response to PetitionRespondent
10/21/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
10/21/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
10/21/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/07/1976Opinion issued
04/07/1976Response to Brief filed
03/23/1976Supplement to Motion for Rehearing
03/04/1976Response to Motion filed
02/19/1976Motion for Rehearing
02/18/1976Motion for Rehearing
10/31/1975Response to Petition
10/31/1975Document received (See Remarks)
10/21/1975Application for Writ of Error - Filed
10/21/1975Application for Writ of Error - Filed
10/21/1975Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Lee Group of Maternal KindredPetitioner
Jinkins Heirs, et al.Petitioner
Estate of Hope Pierce Tartt, deceasedRespondent
Unknow Heirs of Hope Pierce Tartt, deceasedPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information