judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MOORE (VALLIENT) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36320
Short Caption:MOORE (VALLIENT) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR98P0907Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/15/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/20/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/20/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-10566
08/04/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Records due: 120 days. fn1[The records shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 35251, 36104, 36127, 36320. Document No. 00-13537.
08/15/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Mailed on 08/14/00. 00-14226
08/15/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
11/19/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. 'ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED.' NNP02-MS/RR/NB 01-19277
12/17/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-19513
12/17/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/18/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 3, 2002. 01-19513