judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

D.C. OFFICE OF TAX & REVENUE V. SUNBELT BEVERAGE LLC

Case Information: 10-AA-1331
Short Caption:D.C. OFFICE OF TAX & REVENUE V. SUNBELT BEVERAGE LLCClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - OAH - Tax & Revenue
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:TRC800149-09Filed Date:10/28/2010

Opening Event Date:10/28/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/20/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/01/2012
Argued/Submitted:09/26/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/03/2013

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerDistrict of Columbia Office of Tax & RevenueN
Todd S. KimNY
Mary L. WilsonYY
RespondentSunbelt Beverage LLCN
Stephen L. KranzNY
Diann L. SmithYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/28/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW (No fee filed by DC Tax & Revenue).
10/28/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAH and Todd Kim, Esq.
11/18/2010 On consideration of the petition for review, it is ORDERED that the Office of the Administrative Hearings shall file the administrative record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). (JAC)
11/22/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC) elp
12/10/2010 On consideration of the briefing order issued in this matter on November 22, 2010, and it appearing that the record was certified with an incorrect petition for review number and inadvertently filed in this matter, it is ORDERED, sua sponte, that the briefing order issued on November 22, 2010 is hereby vacated. (ETW)
07/20/2011FiledRecord On Appeal
07/20/2011FiledRecord Completed
08/25/2011FiledBriefing Order
09/28/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Petitioner)Granted
10/06/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Petitioner) 11/18/11
11/18/2011FiledBrief (Petitioner)
11/18/2011FiledJoint Appendix (Petitioner)
11/29/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent)Granted
12/06/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent) - 2/1/2012
02/01/2012FiledBrief (Respondent)
02/01/2012FiledBriefing Completed
02/14/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Petitioner)Granted
02/22/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Petitioner) - 4/23/12
04/23/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Petitioner)Granted
04/27/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Petitioner) - 6/7/12
05/08/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
06/04/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Petitioner)Granted
06/25/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Petitioner)
07/03/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
07/09/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Petitioner)Granted
07/11/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Respondent)
07/26/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
07/27/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Petitioner) - 9/10/12
09/10/2012FiledReply Brief (Petitioner)
09/17/2012FiledAppearance by Diann L. Smith (Respondent)
09/25/2012FiledAppearance of Diann L. Smith (Respondent)
09/26/2012FiledArgued before Judges Fisher, Beckwith, Easterly Mary L. Wilson, Esq. for petitioner Dianne L. Smith, Esq. for respondent
01/30/2013FiledChange Of Address Received From appellee's attorney (Respondent)
04/11/2013FiledAffirmed (OPINION) (Fisher, Beckwith, and Easterly, Associate Judges.)
05/03/2013FiledMandate