judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-5591
B-5591
10/15/1975
Application for Writ of Error
AIRWAY INSURANCE COMPANY
HANKS FLITE CENTER, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/21/1976Post submission brief filedPetitioner
10/17/1975Brief on the MeritsRespondent
10/15/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/10/1976Dissenting opinion issued.
03/10/1976Opinion issued
01/21/1976Post submission brief filed
11/15/1975Document received (See Remarks)
11/15/1975Document received (See Remarks)
11/15/1975Document received (See Remarks)
11/05/1975Document received (See Remarks)
10/17/1975Brief on the Merits
10/15/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
10/15/1975Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Airway Insurance CompanyPetitioner
Hanks Flite Center, Inc.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information