judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-5593
B-5593
10/10/1975
Application for Writ of Error
CITY OF WICHITA FALLS
STATE OF TEXAS, EX REL. RICHARD VOGTSBERGER
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/21/1976Notice of Appeal filedRespondent
03/15/1976Motion for RehearingRespondent
01/28/1976Post submission brief filedRespondent
01/23/1976Letter brief Amicus Curiae
11/18/1975Errata FiledRespondent
11/12/1975Response to PetitionPetitioner
10/31/1975Response to PetitionRespondent
10/10/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/06/1976Letter Filed
12/02/1976Opinion from the Court of Appeals filed.
08/02/1976Letter Filed
06/21/1976Miscellaneous letter
06/21/1976Notice of Appeal filed
03/15/1976Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/03/1976Opinion issued
02/04/1976Letter Filed
01/28/1976Post submission brief filed
01/23/1976Letter brief
12/03/1975Document received (See Remarks)
12/03/1975Document received (See Remarks)
12/03/1975Document received (See Remarks)
11/18/1975Errata Filed
11/12/1975Response to Petition
10/31/1975Response to Petition
10/27/1975Conditional application for writ of error filedFiling granted
10/16/1975Document received (See Remarks)
10/10/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
State of Texas, ex rel. Richard VogtsbergerRespondent
EARLE COBB, JR.Amicus Curiae
City of Wichita FallsPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information