judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-89-00402-CR
04-89-00402-CR
08/22/1989
Assault or Attempted Murder
Speed, Danny
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/30/1990Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
05/29/1990Mandate Issued
05/29/1990Mandate Issued
04/11/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/11/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/28/1990Submitted
03/28/1990Submission
03/28/1990Submitted
03/27/1990Submission
03/26/1990Case ready to be set
03/26/1990Brief Filed
03/26/1990Case ready to be set
03/01/1990Brief Filed
02/16/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/15/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
01/19/1990No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
01/16/1990No Description Available.
01/16/1990No Description Available.
01/16/1990No Description Available.
11/14/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
11/10/1989No Description Available.
09/21/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
09/20/1989No Description Available.
09/11/1989No Description Available.
08/22/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/07/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
07/19/1989Date of Sentencing in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/14/2014Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
05/29/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
144th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Susan D. Reed
89-CR-3035
90 years TDC